Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1451 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1451
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 8, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1451 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ability of public school teachers to maintain
 student discipline without being subjected to adverse employment
 consequences.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.351, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In adopting criteria described by Subsection (a)(1),
 the commissioner shall ensure that a teacher may not be assigned an
 area of deficiency in an appraisal solely on the basis of
 disciplinary referrals made by the teacher or documentation
 regarding student conduct submitted by the teacher under Section
 37.002.  This subsection does not prohibit a teacher from being
 assigned an area of deficiency based on documented evidence of a
 deficiency in classroom management obtained through observation or
 a substantiated report.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.352, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A school district may not assign an area of deficiency
 to a teacher solely on the basis of disciplinary referrals made by
 the teacher or documentation regarding student conduct submitted by
 the teacher under Section 37.002.  This subsection does not
 prohibit a teacher from being assigned an area of deficiency based
 on documented evidence of a deficiency in classroom management
 obtained through observation or a substantiated report.
 SECTION 3.  Section 37.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A teacher may document any conduct by a student that
 does not conform to the student code of conduct adopted under
 Section 37.001 and may submit that documentation to the principal.
 A school district may not discipline a teacher on the basis of
 documentation submitted under this subsection.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *