Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1451 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    S.B. No. 1451


 AN ACT
 relating to the ability of public school teachers to maintain
 student discipline without being subjected to adverse employment
 consequences.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.351, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In adopting criteria described by Subsection (a)(1),
 the commissioner shall ensure that a teacher may not be assigned an
 area of deficiency in an appraisal solely on the basis of
 disciplinary referrals made by the teacher or documentation
 regarding student conduct submitted by the teacher under Section
 37.002.  This subsection does not prohibit a teacher from being
 assigned an area of deficiency based on documented evidence of a
 deficiency in classroom management obtained through observation or
 a substantiated report.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.352, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A school district may not assign an area of deficiency
 to a teacher solely on the basis of disciplinary referrals made by
 the teacher or documentation regarding student conduct submitted by
 the teacher under Section 37.002.  This subsection does not
 prohibit a teacher from being assigned an area of deficiency based
 on documented evidence of a deficiency in classroom management
 obtained through observation or a substantiated report.
 SECTION 3.  Section 37.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1) and (e) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A teacher may document any conduct by a student that
 does not conform to the student code of conduct adopted under
 Section 37.001 and may submit that documentation to the principal.
 A school district may not discipline a teacher on the basis of
 documentation submitted under this subsection.
 (e)  A student who is sent to the campus behavior
 coordinator's or other administrator's office under Subsection (a)
 or removed from class under Subsection (b) is not considered to have
 been removed from the classroom for the purposes of reporting data
 through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS)
 or other similar reports required by state or federal law.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1451 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1451 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124,
 Nays 20, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor