Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1453 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2019

                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1453
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1453 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of calculator applications in place of graphing
 calculators in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 25, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 25.904 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.904.  USE OF CALCULATOR APPLICATION IN PLACE OF
 GRAPHING CALCULATOR. (a)  A school district shall permit a student
 enrolled in a course that requires the student to use a graphing
 calculator to use a calculator application on a computing device,
 including a personal, laptop, or tablet computer, that provides the
 same functionality, unless the district makes available to the
 student a graphing calculator at no cost to the student.
 (b)  A school district may adopt policies related to student
 use of a computing device under this section.
 (c)  To the extent this section conflicts with Section
 37.082, this section prevails.
 (d)  The agency shall conduct an evaluation of best practices
 for the use of a calculator application on a computing device by a
 student during an assessment instrument administered under Section
 39.023.  On completion of the evaluation the agency shall adopt
 rules establishing a policy for the permitted use of a calculator
 application on a computing device.  The rules must specify the types
 of calculator applications and computing devices students are
 authorized to use and the circumstances under which each calculator
 application and computing device may be used.  The agency shall post
 to the agency's Internet website and communicate to each school
 district the policy adopted under this subsection and a list of
 approved calculator applications and computing devices, including
 information relating to the cost and functionality of each listed
 calculator application and computing device.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Education Agency shall adopt rules establishing a policy for the
 use of a calculator application on a computing device as required by
 Section 25.904(d), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *