Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1458 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Johnson, Hinojosa S.B. No. 1458
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compliance with federal coding guidelines for certain
 divisions and offices within the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.1023, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 531.1023.  COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL CODING GUIDELINES.
 (a)  The commission's office of inspector general, including
 office staff and any third party with which the office contracts to
 perform coding services, and the commission's medical and
 utilization review appeals unit shall comply with federal coding
 guidelines, including guidelines for diagnosis-related group (DRG)
 validation and related audits.
 (b)  In this section, "federal coding guidelines" means the
 code sets and guidelines adopted by the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services in accordance with the Health Insurance
 Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 (42 U.S.C. Section 1320d
 et seq.).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *