Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1467 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1467
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.101(n), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (n)  In addition to other authorized uses, a municipality
 that has a population of not more than 1,500 and is located in a
 county that borders Arkansas and Louisiana may use revenue from the
 municipal hotel occupancy tax for the promotion of tourism by the
 enhancement and upgrading of an existing sports facility or field
 as specified by Subsection (a)(7), provided that the requirements
 of Subsection [Subsections] (a)(7)(A) [and (C)] and Section
 351.1076 are met.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *