Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1500 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1500
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 15, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to repeal of the waiver of the right to judicial review of
 a wage claim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 61.063, Labor Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.063.  PAYMENT TO COMMISSION; ESCROW PENDING REVIEW[;
 WAIVER].
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.063(b), Labor Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *