Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1511 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Nichols, et al. S.B. No. 1511
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas  9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1511 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of the Battleship "Texas."
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The purpose of this Act is to ensure that the
 Battleship "Texas," a national historic landmark whose engines are
 national mechanical engineering landmarks and that is the only
 remaining battleship to have fought in World War I and World War II,
 is maintained and preserved in satisfactory condition for the
 benefit of the citizens of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 22.261, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.261.  JURISDICTION. The Battleship "Texas" is under
 the jurisdiction of the department.  The department shall enter
 into a memorandum of understanding for a term of 99 years with an
 appropriate nonprofit foundation for the operation and maintenance
 of the Battleship "Texas."
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter T, Chapter 22, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 22.262 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.262.  PRESERVATION STANDARDS. The memorandum of
 understanding required by Section 22.261 must include provisions:
 (1)  governing the preservation, management, and
 operation of the Battleship "Texas" consistent with the Standards
 for Historic Vessel Preservation Projects with Guidelines for
 Applying the Standards published by the Secretary of the United
 States Department of the Interior as those standards existed on
 January 1, 2019;
 (2)  requiring the nonprofit foundation described by
 Section 22.261 to consult with the state historic preservation
 officer on matters related to the preservation or repair of the
 battleship; and
 (3)  regarding the protection of the public's interest
 in maintaining and preserving a priceless historical asset in a
 manner that ensures the public has access to the asset and an
 opportunity to provide comment regarding the preservation of the
 asset.
 SECTION 4.  The Parks and Wildlife Department shall enter
 into the memorandum of understanding required by Section 22.261,
 Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act, not later than the
 later of:
 (1)  September 1, 2019; or
 (2)  the 90th day after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *