Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1511 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    S.B. No. 1511


 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of the Battleship "Texas."
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The purpose of this Act is to ensure that the
 Battleship "Texas," a national historic landmark whose engines are
 national mechanical engineering landmarks and that is the only
 remaining battleship to have fought in World War I and World War II,
 is maintained and preserved in satisfactory condition for the
 benefit of the citizens of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 22.261, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.261.  JURISDICTION. The Battleship "Texas" is under
 the jurisdiction of the department.  The department shall enter
 into a memorandum of understanding for a term of 99 years with an
 appropriate nonprofit foundation for the operation and maintenance
 of the Battleship "Texas."
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter T, Chapter 22, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 22.262 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.262.  PRESERVATION STANDARDS. The memorandum of
 understanding required by Section 22.261 must include provisions:
 (1)  governing the preservation, management, and
 operation of the Battleship "Texas" consistent with the Standards
 for Historic Vessel Preservation Projects with Guidelines for
 Applying the Standards published by the Secretary of the United
 States Department of the Interior as those standards existed on
 January 1, 2019;
 (2)  requiring the nonprofit foundation described by
 Section 22.261 to consult with the state historic preservation
 officer on matters related to the preservation or repair of the
 battleship; and
 (3)  regarding the protection of the public's interest
 in maintaining and preserving a priceless historical asset in a
 manner that ensures the public has access to the asset and an
 opportunity to provide comment regarding the preservation of the
 asset.
 SECTION 4.  The Parks and Wildlife Department shall enter
 into the memorandum of understanding required by Section 22.261,
 Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act, not later than the
 later of:
 (1)  September 1, 2019; or
 (2)  the 90th day after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1511 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 22, 2019, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 25, 2019, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1511 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 134,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 22, 2019, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor