Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1540 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/25/2019

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1540
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 25, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 25, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of support services liaison officers at
 public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9358 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9358.  DESIGNATION OF SUPPORT SERVICES LIAISON
 OFFICER TO ASSIST STUDENTS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each institution of higher education shall designate at
 least one employee of the institution to act as a liaison officer
 for current or incoming students at the institution.  The liaison
 officer shall provide to the students comprehensive information
 regarding support services and other resources available to the
 students, including:
 (1)  resources to access:
 (A)  medical and behavioral health coverage and
 services; and
 (B)  public benefit programs, including programs
 related to food security, affordable housing, and housing
 subsidies;
 (2)  public benefit program case management assistance
 and counseling;
 (3)  parenting and child care resources;
 (4)  employment assistance;
 (5)  financial counseling and tax preparation
 assistance;
 (6)  transportation assistance;
 (7)  student academic success strategies; and
 (8)  any other resources developed by the institution
 to assist the students.
 (c)  An institution of higher education may designate under
 Subsection (b) the same employee to act as liaison officer as the
 employee designated under Section 51.9356 to act as liaison officer
 for current and incoming students at the institution who were
 formerly in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *