Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1572 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2019

                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1572
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; April 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal registration of vacant buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 214.233(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A municipality [located in a county with a population of
 two million or more] may adopt an ordinance requiring owners of
 vacant buildings to register their buildings by filing a
 registration form with a designated municipal official.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *