Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1574 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2019

                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1574
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 March 27, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duties of the Texas Water Development Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.590(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The committee shall:
 (1)  review the progress of colonia water and
 wastewater infrastructure projects managed by the Texas Water
 Development Board and the state agency responsible for
 administering the portion of the federal community development
 block grant nonentitlement program that addresses the
 infrastructure needs of colonias;
 (2)  present an update and make recommendations to the
 board and the Texas Water Development Board annually at a [the]
 joint meeting [required by Section 6.060(d), Water Code,]
 regarding:
 (A)  efforts to ensure that colonia residents are
 connected to the infrastructure funded by state agencies;
 (B)  the financial, managerial, and technical
 capabilities of project owners and operators;
 (C)  the agencies' management of their colonia
 programs and the effectiveness of their policies regarding
 underperforming projects; and
 (D)  any other issues related to the effect of
 state-managed infrastructure programs on colonia residents;
 (3)  review public comments regarding the colonia needs
 assessment incorporated into the state low income housing plan
 under Section 2306.0721; and
 (4)  based on the public comments reviewed under
 Subdivision (3), recommend to the board new colonia programs or
 improvements to existing colonia programs.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 6.060(d), 16.022, and 17.1245(b), Water
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *