Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1579 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2019

                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1579
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 26, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 26, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1579 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of certain emergency services districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 775, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 775.0206 to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0206.  SEPARATION OF DISTRICT SERVICES;
 ALTERNATIVE CREATION PROCEDURE.  (a)  This section applies only to
 a district located in a county with a population of more than 3.3
 million.
 (b)  Notwithstanding the procedures required by this
 subchapter, the board of a district may create another district
 under this section if:
 (1)  the board determines that the creation would
 enable the services currently provided by the creating district to
 be provided in a more economical and efficient manner by the
 creating district and the other district; and
 (2)  the boundaries of the other district are identical
 to the boundaries of the creating district.
 (c)  To create the other district, the board of the creating
 district must adopt an order creating the other district that:
 (1)  names the other district and, if considered
 reasonable by the board of the creating district, renames the
 creating district; and
 (2)  describes the services to be provided by the
 creating district and the other district, including:
 (A)  a statement that specifies the services each
 district will provide; and
 (B)  the proposed date on which the creating
 district will cease to provide a service and the other district will
 begin to provide that service.
 (d)  The order may not provide for the creating district and
 the other district to provide the same service.
 (e)  The board of the creating district must hold an election
 under Section 775.018 to confirm the other district's creation and
 authorize the imposition of a tax by the other district.  The
 creation of the other district is confirmed only if a majority of
 voters voting in the election approve the creation of the other
 district and the imposition of the tax by the other district.
 (f)  Subject to Section 4.003, Election Code, the notice of
 the election to separate district services shall be given in the
 same manner as the notice of a petition hearing under Section
 775.015.
 (g)  An election to create a district under this section must
 be held on a uniform election date as described by Section
 775.018(e).
 (h)  Except as provided by Subsection (i), the board of the
 creating district shall appoint the initial board of the other
 district. The appointed commissioners serve until December 31 of
 the year the other district is created. On the expiration of the
 terms of the initial commissioners, the commissioners court or
 commissioners courts shall appoint commissioners for a full term
 under Section 775.034 or 775.0341, as applicable.
 (i)  If Section 775.0345 or 775.035 applies to a district
 created under this section, the board of the creating district
 shall appoint the initial board of the other district. The
 appointed commissioners serve until the next election date of the
 commissioners of the creating district. The board of the creating
 district shall hold an election for both the board of the creating
 district and the board of the other district under Section 775.0345
 or 775.035, as applicable. The five commissioner positions on each
 board shall be filled at the election held by the creating district.
 For each board, the three elected commissioners receiving the most
 votes serve four-year terms and the two remaining elected
 commissioners serve two-year terms. After the initial election,
 each district shall hold separately an election on the dates and in
 the manner described by Section 775.0345 or 775.035, as
 applicable.
 (j)  To promote the economical and efficient delivery of
 services provided by a creating district and a district created
 under this section, the creating district may convey assets and
 transfer indebtedness, other than bonded indebtedness, to the other
 district.
 (k)  If a creating district has bonded indebtedness at the
 time the district's board creates a district under this section, a
 district created under this section shall pay to the creating
 district annually an amount equal to one-half of the amount
 required to service the bonded indebtedness in that year.
 (l)  Overlapping districts resulting from the creation of a
 district under this section shall comply with Section 775.020 or
 775.0205, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *