Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1674 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1674
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 15, 2019,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0;
 April 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount credited in a state fiscal year to the
 judicial fund to provide basic civil legal services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.007(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The total amount credited to the judicial fund for
 programs approved by the supreme court that provide basic civil
 legal services to the indigent under Subsection (b) may not exceed
 $50 million per state fiscal year [biennium].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *