Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1679 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: West S.B. No. 1679
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 8, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1679 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility of certain children for free
 prekindergarten programs in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.153, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  A child who is eligible for enrollment in a
 prekindergarten class under Subsection (b) at the age of three and
 enrolls in a prekindergarten class at the age of three remains
 eligible for enrollment in a prekindergarten class for the
 following school year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *