Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1697 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1697
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with
 a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex
 offender.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 45.103, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read
 as follows:
 (b)  A court may order a change of name under this subchapter
 for a person with a final felony conviction if:
 (1)  [,] in addition to the requirements of Subsection
 (a), the person has:
 (A) [(1)]  received a certificate of discharge by
 the Texas Department of Criminal Justice or completed a period of
 community supervision or juvenile probation ordered by a court and
 not less than two years have passed from the date of the receipt of
 discharge or completion of community supervision or juvenile
 probation; or
 (B) [(2)]  been pardoned; or
 (2)  the person is requesting to change the person's
 name to the primary name used in the person's criminal history
 record information.
 (c)  A court may order a change of name under this subchapter
 for a person subject to the registration requirements of Chapter
 62, Code of Criminal Procedure, if the person:
 (1)  meets[, in addition to] the requirements of
 Subsection (a) or is requesting to change the person's name to the
 primary name used in the person's criminal history record
 information; and
 (2)  [, the person] provides the court with proof that
 the person has notified the appropriate local law enforcement
 authority of the proposed name change.
 (d)  In this section:
 (1)  "Criminal history record information" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 411.082, Government Code.
 (2)  "Local [subsection, "local] law enforcement
 authority" has the meaning assigned by Article 62.001, Code of
 Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 2.  Section 45.103, Family Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a petition for a change of name that is filed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A petition filed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the petition was filed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *