Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1728 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2019

                    By: Huffman, Lucio S.B. No. 1728
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 4, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 4, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1728 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an interim study by the Texas Commission on Judicial
 Selection regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate
 judges are selected.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  COMMISSION; STUDY. (a)  The Texas Commission on
 Judicial Selection is established to study and review the method by
 which the following judges and justices are selected for office in
 this state:
 (1)  statutory county court judges, including probate
 court judges;
 (2)  district judges; and
 (3)  appellate justices and judges.
 (b)  The study conducted under this section must consider:
 (1)  the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
 section through partisan elections;
 (2)  the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
 judicial selection methods proposed or adopted by other states;
 (3)  the relative merits of alternative methods for
 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
 section, including:
 (A)  lifetime appointment;
 (B)  appointment for a term;
 (C)  appointment for a term, followed by a
 partisan election;
 (D)  appointment for a term, followed by a
 nonpartisan election;
 (E)  appointment for a term, followed by a
 nonpartisan retention election;
 (F)  partisan election for an open seat, followed
 by a nonpartisan retention election for incumbents; and
 (G)  any other method or combination of methods
 for selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of
 this section; and
 (4)  the merits of using a public member board to
 nominate or assess the qualifications of candidates for judicial
 office.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Judicial Selection consists of
 15 members appointed as follows:
 (1)  four members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  four senators appointed by the lieutenant
 governor, including:
 (A)  one senator who is a member of the political
 party with which the lieutenant governor is affiliated; and
 (B)  one senator who is a member of a political
 party other than the political party with which the lieutenant
 governor is affiliated;
 (3)  four members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives,
 including:
 (A)  one representative who is a member of the
 political party with which the speaker of the house is affiliated;
 and
 (B)  one representatives who is a member of a
 political party other than the political party with which the
 speaker of the house is affiliated;
 (4)  one member appointed by the chief justice of the
 Supreme Court of Texas;
 (5)  one member appointed by the presiding judge of the
 Texas Court of Criminal Appeals; and
 (6)  one member appointed by the board of directors of
 the State Bar of Texas.
 (d)  The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the
 members appointed to the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection
 reflect, to the extent practicable, the racial, ethnic, and
 geographic diversity of this state and include individuals who are
 attorneys and individuals who are not attorneys.
 (e)  The governor shall designate the presiding officer of
 the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection.
 (f)  The Texas Commission on Judicial Selection shall
 convene at the call of the presiding officer.
 (g)  A member of the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection
 is not entitled to compensation but is entitled to reimbursement
 for actual and necessary expenses incurred in serving as a member of
 the commission.
 (h)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System shall provide necessary administrative support to the Texas
 Commission on Judicial Selection.
 (i)  Not later than December 31, 2020, the Texas Commission
 on Judicial Selection shall submit to the governor and the
 legislature a report on the commission's findings and
 recommendations on a method or methods for selecting for office
 judges listed in Subsection (a) of this section that ensure a fair,
 impartial, qualified, competent, and stable judiciary. The
 commission shall include in its recommendations specific
 constitutional and statutory changes that appear necessary from the
 results of the commission's study.
 SECTION 2.  ABOLITION OF COMMISSION. The Texas Commission
 on Judicial Selection is abolished and this Act expires January 2,
 2021.
 SECTION 3.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *