Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1734 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 1734
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of a non-profit direct-support
 organization.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.633, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (n) to read as follows:
 (n)  If the comptroller determines that the purpose of a
 direct-support organization established under Subsection (e) has
 been substantially complied with, the comptroller may dissolve the
 organization.  On dissolution, the title to all funds and
 properties then owned by the organization shall transfer to the
 Texas Match the Promise Foundation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *