By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1764 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; April 4, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 4, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to emergency contact and medical information maintained by the Department of Public Safety. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 521.060(e), Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (e) The forms and procedures established and maintained under Subsection (d) must: (1) comply with Subsection (c); and (2) allow the holder of a driver's license or personal identification certificate or an authorized agent of the holder to add, amend, or delete information described by Subsection (d) by submitting an electronic form on the department's Internet website. SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall produce and make available on the department's Internet website an electronic form in accordance with Section 521.060(e), Transportation Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *