Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1769 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1769
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1769 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to collection of taxes by the Texas Alcoholic Beverage
 Commission at certain ports of entry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.37, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission may not engage in or allocate resources
 for the collection of taxes at a port of entry facility located at a
 cruise ship terminal.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *