Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1774 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1774
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1774 By:  Fallon


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to uncollectible fees and costs in criminal actions and
 proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 103.0081(c), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *