Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1780 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 1780
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 23, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1780 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to value-based arrangements in the Medicaid vendor drug
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0701 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0701.  VALUE-BASED ARRANGEMENTS. (a)  In this
 section, "manufacturer" has the meaning assigned by Section
 531.070.
 (b)  Subject to Section 531.071, the commission may enter
 into a value-based arrangement for the Medicaid vendor drug program
 by written agreement with a manufacturer based on outcome data or
 other metrics to which this state and the manufacturer agree in
 writing.  The value-based arrangement may include a rebate, a
 discount, a price reduction, a contribution, risk sharing, a
 reimbursement, payment deferral or installment payments, a
 guarantee, patient care, shared savings payments, withholds, a
 bonus, or any other thing of value.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *