Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1788 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1788
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 2, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1788 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of certain costs associated with certain
 programs of The University of Texas Health Science Center at San
 Antonio.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 660.004, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Funds appropriated for the education of university
 students at The University of Texas Health Science Center at San
 Antonio may be used to pay for costs associated with the educational
 programs for the campus's university-level students attending the
 Laredo Regional Campus and receiving clinical training in Webb
 County and the surrounding communities, including ground or air
 transportation, lodging, and related expenses.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *