Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB18 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/13/2019

                    By: Huffman, Nelson S.B. No. 18
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 13, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 18 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the protection of expressive activities at public
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9315 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9315.  PROTECTED EXPRESSION ON CAMPUS. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Benefit" includes:
 (A)  recognition by or registration with an
 institution of higher education;
 (B)  the use of an institution of higher
 education's facilities for meetings or speaking purposes;
 (C)  the use of channels of communication
 controlled by an institution of higher education; and
 (D)  funding sources made generally available to
 student organizations at an institution of higher education.
 (2)  "Expressive activities" means any speech or
 expressive conduct protected by the First Amendment to the United
 States Constitution or by Section 8, Article I, Texas Constitution,
 and includes assemblies, protests, speeches, the distribution of
 written material, the carrying of signs, and the circulation of
 petitions. The term does not include commercial speech.
 (3)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (4)  "Student organization" includes any organization
 that is composed mostly of students enrolled at an institution of
 higher education and that receives a benefit from the institution.
 (b)  It is the policy of this state to protect the expressive
 rights of persons guaranteed by the constitutions of the United
 States and of this state by:
 (1)  recognizing freedom of speech and assembly as
 central to the mission of institutions of higher education; and
 (2)  ensuring that all persons may assemble peaceably
 on the campuses of institutions of higher education for expressive
 activities, including to listen to the speech of others.
 (c)  An institution of higher education shall:
 (1)  ensure that the common outdoor areas of the
 institution's campus are deemed traditional public forums; and
 (2)  permit any person to engage in expressive
 activities in those areas of the institution's campus freely, as
 long as the person's conduct:
 (A)  is not unlawful; and
 (B)  does not materially and substantially
 disrupt the functioning of the institution.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an institution of
 higher education may adopt a policy that imposes reasonable
 restrictions on the time, place, and manner of expressive
 activities in the common outdoor areas of the institution's campus
 if those restrictions:
 (1)  are narrowly tailored to serve a significant
 institutional interest;
 (2)  employ clear, published, content-neutral, and
 viewpoint-neutral criteria;
 (3)  provide for ample alternative means of expression;
 and
 (4)  allow members of the university community to
 assemble or distribute written material without a permit or other
 permission from the institution.
 (e)  Subsections (c) and (d) do not limit the right of
 student expression at other campus locations.
 (f)  Each institution of higher education shall adopt a
 policy detailing students' rights and responsibilities regarding
 expressive activities at the institution. The policy must:
 (1)  allow:
 (A)  any person to, subject to reasonable
 restrictions adopted under Subsection (d), engage in expressive
 activities on campus, including by responding to the expressive
 activities of others; and
 (B)  student organizations and faculty to,
 subject to Subsection (h), invite speakers to speak on campus;
 (2)  establish disciplinary sanctions for students,
 student organizations, or faculty who unduly interfere with the
 expressive activities of others on campus;
 (3)  include a grievance procedure for addressing
 complaints of a violation of this section;
 (4)  be approved by a majority vote of the institution's
 governing board before final adoption; and
 (5)  be posted on the institution's Internet website.
 (g)  An institution of higher education may not take action
 against a student organization or deny the organization any benefit
 generally available to other student organizations at the
 institution on the basis of a political, religious, philosophical,
 ideological, or academic viewpoint expressed by the organization or
 of any expressive activities of the organization.
 (h)  In determining whether to approve a speaker to speak on
 campus or in determining the amount of a fee to be charged for use of
 the institution's facilities for purposes of engaging in expressive
 activities, an institution of higher education:
 (1)  may consider only content-neutral and
 viewpoint-neutral criteria related to the needs of the event, such
 as:
 (A)  the proposed venue and the expected size of
 the audience;
 (B)  any anticipated need for campus security;
 (C)  any necessary accommodations; and
 (D)  any relevant history of compliance or
 noncompliance by the requesting student organization or faculty
 member with the institution's policy adopted under Subsection (f)
 and any other relevant policies; and
 (2)  may not consider any anticipated controversy
 related to the event.
 (i)  Each institution of higher education shall make the
 institution's policies adopted in accordance with this section
 available to students enrolled at and employees of the institution
 by:
 (1)  including the policies in the institution's
 student handbook and personnel handbook;
 (2)  providing a copy of each policy to students during
 the institution's freshman or transfer student orientation; and
 (3)  posting the policies on the institution's Internet
 website.
 (j)  Each institution of higher education shall develop
 materials, programs, and procedures to ensure that the
 institution's employees responsible for educating or disciplining
 students understand the requirements of this section and all
 policies adopted by the institution in accordance with this
 section.
 (k)  Not later than December 1, 2020, each institution of
 higher education shall prepare, post on the institution's Internet
 website, and submit to the governor and the members of the
 legislature a report regarding the institution's implementation of
 the requirements under this section.  This subsection expires
 September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than August 1, 2020, each public
 institution of higher education shall adopt the policy required
 under Section 51.9315(f), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *