Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1801 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 1801
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1801 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of
 trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.0728, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.0728.  PROCEDURE FOR CERTAIN VICTIMS OF TRAFFICKING
 OF PERSONS OR COMPELLING PROSTITUTION. (a)  This section applies
 only to a person:
 (1)  who is convicted of or placed on deferred
 adjudication community supervision [under Chapter 42A, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, after conviction] for an offense under:
 (A)  Section 481.120, Health and Safety Code, if
 the offense is punishable under Subsection (b)(1);
 (B)  Section 481.121, Health and Safety Code, if
 the offense is punishable under Subsection (b)(1);
 (C)  Section 31.03, Penal Code, if the offense is
 punishable under Subsection (e)(1) or (2); or
 (D)  Section 43.02, Penal Code; [or
 [(E)     Section 43.03(a)(2), Penal Code, if the
 offense is punishable as a Class A misdemeanor;] and
 (2)  who, if requested by the applicable law
 enforcement agency or prosecuting attorney to provide assistance in
 the investigation or prosecution of an offense under Section
 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal Code, or a federal offense
 containing elements that are substantially similar to the elements
 of an offense under any of those sections:
 (A)  provided assistance in the investigation or
 prosecution of the offense; or
 (B)  did not provide assistance in the
 investigation or prosecution of the offense due to the person's age
 or a physical or mental disability resulting from being a victim of
 an offense described by this subdivision [with respect to whom the
 conviction is subsequently set aside by the court under Article
 42A.701, Code of Criminal Procedure].
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter
 or Subchapter F, a person described by Subsection (a) who satisfies
 the requirements of Section 411.074(b) [411.074] may petition the
 court that convicted the person or placed the person on deferred
 adjudication community supervision for an order of nondisclosure of
 criminal history record information under this section on the
 grounds that the person committed the offense solely as a victim of
 an offense under Section 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal Code
 [trafficking of persons].
 (b-1)  A petition under Subsection (b) must:
 (1)  be in writing;
 (2)  allege specific facts that, if proved, would
 establish that the petitioner committed the offense described by
 Subsection (a)(1) solely as a victim of an offense under Section
 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal Code; and
 (3)  assert that if the person has previously submitted
 a petition for [seeking] an order of nondisclosure under this
 section, the person has not committed an offense described by
 Subsection (a)(1) on or after the date on which the person's first
 petition [previously received an order of nondisclosure] under this
 section was submitted.
 (b-2)  On the filing of the petition under Subsection (b),
 the clerk of the court shall promptly serve a copy of the petition
 and any supporting document on the appropriate office of the
 attorney representing the state. Any response to the petition by
 the attorney representing the state must be filed not later than the
 20th business day after the date of service under this subsection.
 (b-3)  A person convicted of or placed on deferred
 adjudication community supervision for more than one offense
 described by Subsection (a)(1) that the person committed solely as
 a victim of an offense under Section 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal
 Code, may file a petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal
 history record information under this section with respect to each
 offense, and may request consolidation of those petitions, in a
 district court in the county where the person was most recently
 convicted or placed on deferred adjudication community supervision
 as described by this subsection. On receipt of a request for
 consolidation, the court shall consolidate the petitions and
 exercise jurisdiction over the petitions, regardless of the county
 in which the offenses described by Subsection (a)(1) occurred. For
 each offense that is the subject of a consolidated petition and that
 occurred in a county other than the county in which the court
 consolidating the petitions is located, the clerk of the court, in
 addition to the clerk's duties under Subsection (b-2), shall
 promptly serve a copy of the consolidated petition and any
 supporting document related to the applicable offense on the
 appropriate office of the attorney representing the state on behalf
 of the other county. Each attorney representing the state who
 receives a copy of a consolidated petition under this subsection
 may file a response to the petition in accordance with Subsection
 (b-2).
 (b-4)  A district court that consolidates petitions under
 Subsection (b-3) shall allow an attorney representing the state who
 receives a petition involving an offense that was committed outside
 the county in which the court is located to appear at any hearing
 regarding the consolidated petition by telephone or video
 conference call.
 (c)  After notice to the state and[,] an opportunity for a
 hearing, [a determination by the court that the person has not
 previously received an order of nondisclosure under this section,
 and a determination by the court that the person committed the
 offense solely as a victim of trafficking of persons and that
 issuance of the order is in the best interest of justice,] the court
 having jurisdiction over the petition shall issue an order
 prohibiting criminal justice agencies from disclosing to the public
 criminal history record information related to the offense if the
 court determines that:
 (1)  the person committed the offense described by
 Subsection (a)(1) solely as a victim of an offense under Section
 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal Code;
 (2)  if applicable, the person did not commit another
 offense described by Subsection (a)(1) on or after the date on which
 the person's first petition for an order of nondisclosure under
 this section was submitted; and
 (3)  issuance of the order is in the best interest of
 justice [for which the defendant was placed on community
 supervision as described by Subsection (a)].
 (c-1)  In determining whether a person committed an offense
 described by Subsection (a)(1) solely as a victim of an offense
 under Section 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal Code, the court may
 consider any order of nondisclosure previously granted to the
 person under this section.
 (d)  A person may petition the applicable court [that placed
 the person on community supervision] for an order of nondisclosure
 of criminal history record information under this section only on
 or after the first anniversary of the date the person:
 (1)  completed the sentence, including any term of
 confinement imposed and payment of all fines, costs, and
 restitution imposed; or
 (2)  received a dismissal and discharge under Article
 42A.111, Code of Criminal Procedure, if the person was placed on
 deferred adjudication community supervision [person's conviction
 is set aside as described by Subsection (a)].
 SECTION 2.  Article 56.021, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A victim of an offense under Section 20A.02, 20A.03, or
 43.05, Penal Code, is entitled to be informed that the victim may
 petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record
 information under Section 411.0728, Government Code, if the victim:
 (1)  has been convicted of or placed on deferred
 adjudication community supervision for an offense described by
 Subsection (a)(1) of that section; and
 (2)  committed that offense solely as a victim of an
 offense under Section 20A.02, 20A.03, or 43.05, Penal Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 126.004, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A program established under this chapter shall provide
 each program participant with information related to the right to
 petition for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record
 information under Section 411.0728.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *