Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1811 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2019

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1811
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 26, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 26, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1811 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continuing education training on civil process for
 constables.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.3545, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a), (b), and (f) and adding Subsection
 (b-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  A public institution of higher education selected by the
 commission shall establish and offer a program of initial training
 and a program of continuing education for constables.  The
 curriculum for each program must relate to law enforcement
 management [and civil process issues].  The institution selected
 under this subsection shall develop the curriculum for the
 programs.  The curriculum must be approved by the commission.
 (b)  Each constable must complete at least 40 hours of
 continuing education provided by the selected institution under
 Subsection (a) [this section] each 48-month period.  The commission
 by rule shall establish a uniform 48-month continuing education
 training period.
 (b-1)  In addition to the requirements of Subsection (b),
 during each 48-month continuing education training period each
 constable must complete at least 20 hours of continuing education
 instruction on civil process to be provided by a public institution
 of higher education selected by the commission under this
 subsection.  The commission shall establish minimum curriculum
 requirements for the continuing education course on civil process
 required by this subsection.  The commission may waive the
 continuing education requirements of this subsection if:
 (1)  a constable requests a waiver because of hardship;
 and
 (2)  the commission determines that a hardship exists.
 (f)  An individual who is subject to the continuing education
 requirements of Subsections [Subsection] (b) and (b-1) is exempt
 from other continuing education requirements under this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *