Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1818 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1818


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a competitive and integrated employment initiative for
 certain Medicaid recipients.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02448 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02448.  COMPETITIVE AND INTEGRATED EMPLOYMENT
 INITIATIVE FOR CERTAIN MEDICAID RECIPIENTS. (a)  This section
 applies to an individual receiving services under any of the
 following waiver programs established under Section 1915(c),
 Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1396n(c)):
 (1)  the home and community-based services (HCS) waiver
 program;
 (2)  the Texas home living (TxHmL) waiver program;
 (3)  the deaf-blind with multiple disabilities (DBMD)
 waiver program;
 (4)  the community living assistance and support
 services (CLASS) waiver program; and
 (5)  the STAR+PLUS home and community-based services
 (HCBS) waiver program.
 (b)  The executive commissioner by rule shall develop a
 uniform process that complies with the policy adopted under Section
 531.02447 to:
 (1)  assess the goals of and competitive and integrated
 employment opportunities and related employment services available
 to an individual to whom this section applies; and
 (2)  use the identified goals and available
 opportunities and services to direct the individual's plan of care
 at the time the plan is developed or renewed.
 (c)  The entity responsible for the development and renewal
 of the plan of care for an individual to whom this section applies
 shall use the uniform process the executive commissioner develops
 to assess the individual's goals, opportunities, and services
 described by Subsection (b) and incorporate those goals,
 opportunities, and services into the plan of care.
 (d)  The executive commissioner by rule shall:
 (1)  establish performance measures for the employment
 of individuals to whom this section applies and who are seeking
 competitive and integrated employment;
 (2)  identify strategies to increase the number of
 individuals who are receiving employment services from the Texas
 Workforce Commission or through the waiver program in which an
 individual is enrolled;
 (3)  determine a reasonable number of individuals who
 indicate a desire to work to receive employment services and ensure
 those individuals:
 (A)  have received employment services during the
 state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2021, or during the period
 beginning September 1, 2021, and ending December 31, 2021, from the
 Texas Workforce Commission or through the waiver program in which
 an individual is enrolled; or
 (B)  are receiving employment services on
 December 31, 2021, from the Texas Workforce Commission or through
 the waiver program in which an individual is enrolled; and
 (4)  ensure each individual who indicates a desire to
 work is referred to receive employment services from the Texas
 Workforce Commission or through the waiver program in which the
 individual is enrolled.
 (e)  Not later than December 31 of each even-numbered year,
 the executive commissioner shall prepare and submit to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and legislature a written report that outlines:
 (1)  the number of individuals to whom this section
 applies who are receiving employment services in accordance with
 rules adopted under this section;
 (2)  whether the employment services described by
 Subdivision (1) are provided by the Texas Workforce Commission,
 through the waiver program in which an individual is enrolled, or
 both; and
 (3)  the number of individuals to whom this section
 applies who have obtained competitive and integrated employment,
 categorized by waiver program and, if applicable, an individual's
 level of care.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 Section 531.02448, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 531.02448(e),
 Government Code, as added by this Act, the executive commissioner
 of the Health and Human Services Commission shall submit the first
 report required by that section not later than December 31, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money to the commission specifically for
 that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the commission may, but is not
 required to, implement a provision of this Act using other
 appropriations that are available for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.