Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1861 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2019

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1861
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 11, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain public facilities financed, owned, and operated
 by a public facility corporation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 303.021, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This chapter expressly authorizes a sponsor to which
 Section 303.042(d) does not apply to create a corporation to
 finance, own, and operate a multifamily residential development
 that meets the requirements of Section 303.042(d-1).
 SECTION 2.  Section 303.042, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (d-1) and (g) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  An exemption under this section for a multifamily
 residential development that is owned by a corporation created
 under this chapter and that is not otherwise described by
 Subsection (d) applies only if the development meets the
 requirements of Subsection (d)(2) or accomplishes a governmental
 purpose of the sponsor.
 (g)  For purposes of Subsections (a) and (b), if a
 corporation created under this chapter owns a multifamily
 residential development described by Subsection (d-1), the sponsor
 of the corporation is considered the user of the public facility.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *