Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1882 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2019

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1882
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 30, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 30, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1882 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice regarding voting by physicians at certain
 entities to authorize the differentiation of physicians based on
 maintenance of certification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.1011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.1011.  HOSPITAL AUTHORITY TO DIFFERENTIATE BASED ON
 MAINTENANCE OF CERTIFICATION. An entity to which Section 151.0515,
 Occupations Code, applies violates this chapter if the entity does
 not comply with the requirements of Section 151.0515(c-1),
 Occupations Code, regarding the provision of written notice
 regarding the ability to vote on the entity's differentiation
 between physicians based on a physician's maintenance of
 certification.
 SECTION 2.  Section 151.0515, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  An entity described by Subsection (a) shall provide
 written notice to the voting physician members of the entity's
 organized medical staff of the process by which the members may vote
 on the entity's differentiation between physicians based on a
 physician's maintenance of certification.  The notice must:
 (1)  state that any vote must comply with the voting
 process provided by the bylaws of the entity's organized medical
 staff; and
 (2)  be provided:
 (A)  at least once each calendar year; and
 (B)  in a form acceptable to the entity and the
 entity's organized medical staff.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *