Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1913 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2019

                    By: Johnson, Fallon S.B. No. 1913
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 19, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 2, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1913 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain cities to change the date on which
 their general election for officers is held.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The governing body of a city with a population of 1.18
 million or more, located predominantly in a county that has a total
 area of less than 1,000 square miles, that has adopted a
 council-manager form of government and that holds its general
 election for officers on a date other than the November uniform
 election date may, not later than December 31, 2020, change the date
 on which it holds its general election for officers to the November
 uniform election date. This subsection expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *