Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1928 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2019

                    S.B. No. 1928


 AN ACT
 relating to a certificate of merit in certain actions against
 certain licensed or registered professionals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 150.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subdivisions (1-a) and (1-b) and
 adding Subdivisions (1-c) and (1-d) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Claimant" means a party, including a plaintiff
 or third-party plaintiff, seeking recovery for damages,
 contribution, or indemnification.
 (1-b) "Complaint" means any petition or other pleading
 which, for the first time, raises a claim against a licensed or
 registered professional for damages arising out of the provision of
 professional services by the licensed or registered professional.
 (1-c)  "Licensed or registered professional" means a
 licensed architect, licensed professional engineer, registered
 professional land surveyor, registered landscape architect, or any
 firm in which such licensed or registered professional practices,
 including but not limited to a corporation, professional
 corporation, limited liability corporation, partnership, limited
 liability partnership, sole proprietorship, joint venture, or any
 other business entity.
 (1-d)  [(1-b)]  "National model code group" means an
 organization consisting of industry and government fire and
 building safety officials that develops and promulgates a national
 model code, as defined by Section 214.217, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 150.002(a), (c), and (e), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In any action or arbitration proceeding for damages
 arising out of the provision of professional services by a licensed
 or registered professional, a claimant [the plaintiff] shall be
 required to file with the complaint an affidavit of a third-party
 licensed architect, licensed professional engineer, registered
 landscape architect, or registered professional land surveyor who:
 (1)  is competent to testify;
 (2)  holds the same professional license or
 registration as the defendant; and
 (3)  practices [is knowledgeable] in the area of
 practice of the defendant and offers testimony based on the
 person's:
 (A)  knowledge;
 (B)  skill;
 (C)  experience;
 (D)  education;
 (E)  training; and
 (F)  practice.
 (c)  The contemporaneous filing requirement of Subsection
 (a) shall not apply to any case in which the period of limitation
 will expire within 10 days of the date of filing and, because of
 such time constraints, a claimant [the plaintiff] has alleged that
 an affidavit of a third-party licensed architect, licensed
 professional engineer, registered landscape architect, or
 registered professional land surveyor could not be prepared.  In
 such cases, the claimant [plaintiff] shall have 30 days after the
 filing of the complaint to supplement the pleadings with the
 affidavit.  The trial court may, on motion, after hearing and for
 good cause, extend such time as it shall determine justice
 requires.
 (e)  A claimant's [The plaintiff's] failure to file the
 affidavit in accordance with this section shall result in dismissal
 of the complaint against the defendant.  This dismissal may be with
 prejudice.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action or arbitration proceeding commenced on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An action or arbitration proceeding
 commenced before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1928 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1928 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor