Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2011 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/02/2019

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 2011
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 2, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2011 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report regarding streamlining physician
 licensing requirements for advanced practice registered nurses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.06693 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.06693.  STUDY REGARDING STREAMLINING PHYSICIAN
 LICENSING REQUIREMENTS FOR ADVANCED PRACTICE REGISTERED NURSES.
 (a)  The board shall collaborate with at least one institution of
 higher education, the Texas Medical Board, and the Texas Board of
 Nursing to conduct a study regarding the feasibility of developing
 a pilot program to streamline the requirements for an advanced
 practice registered nurse to become eligible under Chapter 155,
 Occupations Code, for a license to practice medicine.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the board shall submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and each legislative standing committee with
 primary jurisdiction over matters relating to higher education or
 occupational licensing a report on the results of the study and any
 recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *