By: Fallon S.B. No. 2042 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 16, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2042 By: Fallon A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study by the Texas Education Agency of career and technology education programs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 29, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 29.193 to read as follows: Sec. 29.193. STUDY AND REPORT ON CREDENTIALS AND CERTIFICATES. (a) The agency shall conduct a study to: (1) evaluate the industry-recognized credentials and certificates that are currently being offered to public high school students through career and technology education programs in each region of the state; and (2) identify any unmet needs in career and technology education programs currently being offered to public high school students in each region of the state. (b) The study must: (1) for each region of the state: (A) evaluate: (i) the industry-recognized credentials or certificates currently being offered to public high school students through career and technology education programs in the region; and (ii) the knowledge and skills necessary to meet workforce needs in the region; and (B) identify: (i) any gaps between the industry-recognized credentials or certificates identified under Paragraph (A)(i) and the knowledge and skills identified under Paragraph (A)(ii); and (ii) any knowledge or skills that could be incorporated into career and technology education programs in the region to increase students' marketability in that region after graduation from high school; and (2) for each currently offered industry-recognized credential or certificate, assess the economic impact of earning the credential or certificate in each region of the state, including: (A) the average industry wage for a student who has earned the credential or certificate in each region; and (B) the demand to employ a student in each region for the credential or certificate. (c) Not later than September 1, 2021, the agency shall submit to the commissioner a report that: (1) identifies any currently offered industry-recognized credential or certificate that does not provide a sufficient positive economic impact in any region of the state based on the assessment conducted under Subsection (b)(2); and (2) recommends the creation of industry-recognized credentials or certificates for each region of the state to be offered in a career and technology education program in that region that will address unmet workforce needs and enhance student competitiveness in the labor market. (d) This section expires September 1, 2022. SECTION 2. The Texas Education Agency is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to, implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *