Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2048 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2048
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of the fund for veterans' assistance to provide
 pro bono legal services to veterans and active duty service
 members.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.017(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Money in the fund may only be appropriated to the Texas
 Veterans Commission.  Money appropriated under this subsection
 shall be used to:
 (1)  make grants to address veterans' needs;
 (2)  make grants to provide pro bono legal services to
 veterans, active duty members of the United States armed forces,
 and members of the state military forces;
 (3)  administer the fund; and
 (4) [(3)]  analyze and investigate data received from
 the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS)
 that is administered by the Administration for Children and
 Families of the United States Department of Health and Human
 Services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *