Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2075 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 2075
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 23, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2075 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public school compliance with dyslexia screening,
 reading instrument requirements, and a requirement that a school
 district notify certain parents or guardians of a program providing
 students with reading disabilities the ability to borrow audiobooks
 free of charge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.028(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 28.006, 29.001(5),
 29.010(a), 38.003, or 39.057, the agency may monitor compliance
 with requirements applicable to a process or program provided by a
 school district, campus, program, or school granted charters under
 Chapter 12, including the process described by Subchapter F,
 Chapter 11, or a program described by Subchapter B, C, D, E, F, H, or
 I, Chapter 29, or Subchapter A, Chapter 37, [or Section 38.003,] and
 the use of funds provided for such a program under Subchapter C,
 Chapter 42, only as necessary to ensure:
 (1)  compliance with federal law and regulations;
 (2)  financial accountability, including compliance
 with grant requirements; and
 (3)  data integrity for purposes of:
 (A)  the Public Education Information Management
 System (PEIMS); and
 (B)  accountability under Chapters 39 and 39A.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.006, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (g-2) and (l) to read as follows:
 (g-2)  In accordance with a notification program developed
 by the commissioner by rule, a school district shall notify the
 parent or guardian of each student determined, on the basis of a
 screening under Section 38.003 or other basis, to have dyslexia or a
 related disorder, or determined, on the basis of reading instrument
 results, to be at risk for dyslexia or other reading difficulties,
 of the program maintained by the Texas State Library and Archives
 Commission providing students with reading disabilities the
 ability to borrow audiobooks free of charge.
 (l)  The agency by rule shall develop procedures designed to
 allow the agency to:
 (1)  effectively audit and monitor and periodically
 conduct site visits of all school districts to ensure that
 districts are complying with this section;
 (2)  identify any problems school districts experience
 in complying with this section; and
 (3)  develop reasonable and appropriate remedial
 strategies to address school district noncompliance and ensure the
 purposes of this section are accomplished.
 SECTION 3.  Section 38.003, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (c-1), the [The] State Board of
 Education shall adopt any rules and standards necessary to
 administer this section.
 (c-1)  The agency by rule shall develop procedures designed
 to allow the agency to:
 (1)  effectively audit and monitor and periodically
 conduct site visits of all school districts to ensure that
 districts are complying with this section, including the program
 approved by the State Board of Education under this section;
 (2)  identify any problems school districts experience
 in complying with this section, including the program approved by
 the State Board of Education under this section; and
 (3)  develop reasonable and appropriate remedial
 strategies to address school district noncompliance and ensure the
 purposes of this section are accomplished.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  The Texas Education Agency is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *