Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2086 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2086
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2086 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a single Internet portal or equivalent electronic
 system through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive
 information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 533.0055, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), and
 (f) to read as follows:
 (b)  The provider protection plan required under this
 section must provide for:
 (1)  prompt payment and proper reimbursement of
 providers by managed care organizations;
 (2)  prompt and accurate adjudication of claims
 through:
 (A)  provider education on the proper submission
 of clean claims and on appeals;
 (B)  acceptance of uniform forms, including HCFA
 Forms 1500 and UB-92 and subsequent versions of those forms,
 through an interoperable electronic portal or equivalent
 electronic system; and
 (C)  the establishment of standards for claims
 payments in accordance with a provider's contract;
 (3)  adequate and clearly defined provider network
 standards that are specific to provider type, including physicians,
 general acute care facilities, and other provider types defined in
 the commission's network adequacy standards in effect on January 1,
 2013, and that ensure choice among multiple providers to the
 greatest extent possible;
 (4)  a prompt credentialing process for providers;
 (5)  uniform efficiency standards and requirements for
 managed care organizations for the submission and tracking of
 preauthorization requests for services provided under Medicaid;
 (6)  establishment and maintenance of an interoperable
 [electronic process, including the use of an] Internet portal or
 equivalent electronic system with real-time capabilities [,]
 through which providers in any managed care organization's provider
 network may:
 (A)  submit electronic claims, prior
 authorization requests, claims appeals and reconsiderations,
 clinical data, and other documentation that the managed care
 organization requests for prior authorization and claims
 processing; and
 (B)  obtain electronic remittance advice,
 explanation of benefits statements, and other standardized
 reports;
 (7)  the measurement of the rates of retention by
 managed care organizations of significant traditional providers;
 (8)  the creation of a work group to review and make
 recommendations to the commission concerning any requirement under
 this subsection for which immediate implementation is not feasible
 at the time the plan is otherwise implemented, including the
 required process for submission and acceptance of attachments for
 claims processing and prior authorization requests through the
 Internet portal or equivalent electronic system required by [an
 electronic process under] Subdivision (6) and, for any requirement
 that is not implemented immediately, recommendations regarding the
 expected:
 (A)  fiscal impact of implementing the
 requirement; and
 (B)  timeline for implementation of the
 requirement; and
 (9)  any other provision that the commission determines
 will ensure efficiency or reduce administrative burdens on
 providers participating in a Medicaid managed care model or
 arrangement.
 (c)  The commission, using existing resources, shall
 consolidate each electronic or Internet portal operated or
 maintained by the commission for the commission's use, including
 through a contract with a separate entity, that is used to receive
 and deliver requests and other information from and to Medicaid
 providers, including nursing facility providers participating in
 the STAR+PLUS Medicaid managed care program, into the single
 Internet portal or equivalent electronic system required by
 Subsection (b)(6).  The commission shall:
 (1)  ensure the single Internet portal or equivalent
 electronic system meets the requirements of a portal described by
 Sections 531.02411, 533.00251, 533.002553, and 533.0071; and
 (2)  implement a method that allows:
 (A)  each managed care organization to connect
 with the single Internet portal or equivalent electronic system;
 and
 (B)  a provider to access the single Internet
 portal or equivalent electronic system both directly and through a
 managed care organization's Internet website.
 (d)  The commission may contract with a private or nonprofit
 entity to develop, operate, and maintain the single Internet portal
 or equivalent electronic system required by Subsection (b)(6). The
 entity may not be affiliated with any specific managed care plan,
 the Texas Medicaid and Healthcare Partnership, or another entity
 serving as the state's Medicaid claims administrator.
 (e)  The executive commissioner by rule shall require each
 managed care organization to allow providers in the organization's
 provider network to use the single Internet portal or equivalent
 electronic system required by Subsection (b)(6).
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other law, a provider in a managed
 care organization's provider network may continue to use a provider
 portal made available by the managed care organization that is
 interoperable with the single Internet portal or equivalent
 electronic system, as applicable, required by Subsection (b)(6)
 instead of accessing the single Internet portal or equivalent
 electronic system directly.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2021, the Health and
 Human Services Commission, or an entity with which the commission
 contracts, shall develop and implement the single Internet portal
 or equivalent electronic system required by Section 533.0055,
 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *