Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2117 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2117
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 29, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2117 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to state funding and accountability intervention and
 sanction provisions applicable to school district campuses and
 programs operated under school district and charter partnerships.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.157, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.157.  CONTRACTS FOR EDUCATIONAL SERVICES. (a)  The
 board of trustees of an independent school district may contract
 with a public or private entity for that entity to provide
 educational services for the district.
 (b)  A school district that contracts with the governing body
 of an open-enrollment charter school to jointly operate a campus or
 campus program qualifies for funding under Section 42.2511 for each
 student or the portion of each student's school day under the
 direction of the open-enrollment charter school if the most recent
 accountability rating of:
 (1)  the campus was a C or higher under Subchapter C,
 Chapter 39; and
 (2)  the open-enrollment charter school was a C or
 higher under Subchapters C and D, Chapter 39.
 (c)  The commissioner may adopt rules and collect data to
 determine the portion of funding a school district is entitled to
 under Subsection (b) if the district contracts with an
 open-enrollment charter school to jointly operate a campus program.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 11.174(a) and (i), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A school district campus [qualifies for an exemption
 from intervention as provided by Subsection (f) and] qualifies for
 funding as provided by Section 42.2511 if the board of trustees of
 the district contracts to partner to operate the district campus as
 provided by this section with:
 (1)  the governing body of an open-enrollment charter
 school; or
 (2)  on approval by the commissioner, an entity granted
 a charter by the district under Subchapter C, Chapter 12, that is
 eligible to be awarded a charter under Section 12.101(a).
 (i)  A [The] contract entered into as provided by this
 section [of a campus subject to Subsection (f)] must provide that
 any student residing in the attendance zone of the district campus
 as the attendance zone existed before operation of the district
 campus under the contract shall be admitted for enrollment at the
 campus.  The contract must establish enrollment preference for
 students who do not reside in the attendance zone as follows:
 (1)  other students residing in the school district in
 which the campus is located; and
 (2)  students who reside outside the school district.
 SECTION 3.  Section 39A.107, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If, after a turnaround plan has been ordered under
 Section 39A.101, the commissioner approves a contract under Section
 11.174, the campus turnaround plan is considered to have been
 approved by the commissioner as provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 4.  Sections 42.2511(a) and (b), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a school district and an open-enrollment charter
 school that enter into a contract to operate a district campus as
 provided by Section 11.174; [and]
 (2)  a charter granted by a school district for a
 program operated by an entity that has entered into a contract under
 Section 11.174, provided that the district does not appoint a
 majority of the governing body of the charter holder; and
 (3)  a school district that contracts with an
 open-enrollment charter school to jointly operate a campus or
 campus program as provided by Section 11.157(b).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter or
 Chapter 41, a school district subject to this section is entitled to
 receive for each student in average daily attendance at the campus
 or program described by Subsection (a) an amount equivalent to the
 difference, if the difference results in increased funding,
 between:
 (1)  the amount described by Section 12.106; and
 (2)  the amount to which the district would be entitled
 under this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 11.174(f) and (g), Education Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 6.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 7.  The Texas Education Agency is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *