Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2117 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    S.B. No. 2117


 AN ACT
 relating to approval of school district and charter school
 partnerships to operate school district campuses and programs and
 to eligibility for state funding.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.157, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.157.  CONTRACTS FOR EDUCATIONAL SERVICES. (a)  The
 board of trustees of an independent school district may contract
 with a public or private entity for that entity to provide
 educational services for the district.
 (b)  A school district under contract with an
 open-enrollment charter school to jointly operate a campus or
 campus program during the 2017-2018 school year and under any
 renewal of that contract is eligible to receive funding under
 Section 42.2511 for each student or the portion of each student's
 school day under the direction of the open-enrollment charter
 school.  The commissioner may adopt rules to determine the portion
 of funding a school district is entitled to under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 42.2511(a) and (b), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a school district and an open-enrollment charter
 school that enter into a contract to operate a district campus as
 provided by Section 11.174; [and]
 (2)  a charter granted by a school district for a
 program operated by an entity that has entered into a contract under
 Section 11.174, provided that the district does not appoint a
 majority of the governing body of the charter holder; and
 (3)  a school district that contracts with an
 open-enrollment charter school to jointly operate a campus or
 campus program as provided by Section 11.157(b).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter or
 Chapter 41, a school district subject to this section is entitled to
 receive for each student in average daily attendance at the campus
 or program described by Subsection (a) an amount equivalent to the
 difference, if the difference results in increased funding,
 between:
 (1)  the amount described by Section 12.106; and
 (2)  the amount to which the district would be entitled
 under this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2117 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2117 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 103,
 Nays 37, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor