Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2136 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Powell S.B. No. 2136
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the admissibility of evidence in the prosecution of an
 offense committed against a member of the defendant's family or
 household or person in a dating relationship with the defendant.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Article 38.371, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Art. 38.371.  EVIDENCE IN PROSECUTION [PROSECUTIONS] OF
 OFFENSE COMMITTED AGAINST MEMBER OF DEFENDANT'S FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD
 OR PERSON IN DATING RELATIONSHIP WITH DEFENDANT [CERTAIN OFFENSES
 INVOLVING FAMILY VIOLENCE].
 SECTION 2.  Article 38.371(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This article applies to a proceeding in the prosecution
 of a defendant for an offense, or for an attempt or conspiracy to
 commit an offense, for which the alleged victim is [that is
 committed under:
 [(1) Section 22.01, 22.02, or 22.04, Penal Code,
 against] a person whose relationship to or association with the
 defendant is described by Section 71.0021(b), 71.003, or 71.005,
 Family Code[; or
 [(2) Section 25.07 or 25.072, Penal Code, if the offense
 is based on a violation of an order or a condition of bond in a case
 involving family violence].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 admissibility of evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences
 on or after the effective date of this Act.  The admissibility of
 evidence in a criminal proceeding that commences before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the proceeding commenced, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *