Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2168 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2019

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 2168
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 4, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 4, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to relief from local matching funds requirements for
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 222.053, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a county is
 considered to be an "economically disadvantaged county" for the
 purposes of this section if it meets the criteria as laid out in
 Subsection (a) within the past six years and has been included in no
 less than five federally declared disasters within the same time
 period.
 (a-2)  For a county described by Subsection (a-1), the
 adjustment to the local matching funds requirement shall be
 equivalent to the highest adjustment rate set in the last year the
 county was considered to meet the criteria described in Subsection
 (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *