Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2202 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Fallon S.B. No. 2202
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the Jobs and Education for Texans
 (JET) Grant Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 134.004, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  In awarding grants under this chapter, the commission,
 to the extent feasible, shall distribute grants equally across
 geographic areas of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 134.007, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.007.  GRANTS AWARDED TO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL
 DISTRICT. (a)  The commission may award a grant to an independent
 school district under this chapter if the district has entered into
 a partnership with a public junior college, public technical
 institute, or public state college for the purpose of:
 (1)  promoting career and technical education to the
 district's students; or
 (2)  offering dual credit courses to the district's
 students.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), an independent school
 district located in a rural area of this state in which no public
 junior college, public technical institute, or public state college
 is located in close geographic proximity to the district may be
 awarded a grant under this chapter to provide career and technical
 education courses or programs to students in the district in
 partnership with a local manufacturing facility in the area. The
 commission shall adopt rules for the administration of this
 subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 134, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Section 134.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 134.009.  BIENNIAL REPORT. (a)  Not later than
 November 1 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall prepare
 and submit to each standing legislative committee with primary
 jurisdiction over workforce development or higher education a
 report regarding the grant activities and grant recipients under
 this chapter, including the results and outcomes of grants awarded
 under this chapter.
 (b)  The report must:
 (1)  identify high-demand occupations in this state and
 evaluate how grants awarded under this chapter have been used to
 support courses or programs that prepare students for employment in
 those occupations; and
 (2)  include the following data for the most recent
 two-year period for which the information is available,
 disaggregated by appropriate region as determined by the
 commission:
 (A)  the number of students receiving career and
 technical education funded by grants awarded under this chapter;
 (B)  the number of students attaining a
 certificate, a degree, or an industry certification or other
 workforce credential as a result of receiving career and technical
 education funded by grants awarded under this chapter;
 (C)  the number of students entering the workforce
 who received career and technical education funded by grants
 awarded under this chapter; and
 (D)  any losses or gains in manufacturing jobs and
 the effect of those losses or gains on workforce education needs.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *