Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2223 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2019

                    S.B. No. 2223


 AN ACT
 relating to the efficient provision of pilot services by the board
 of pilot commissioners for Harris County ports.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5007.209(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The training program must provide the person with
 information regarding:
 (1)  the legislation that created the authority;
 (2)  the programs, functions, policies, rules, and
 budget of the authority;
 (3)  the results of the most recent formal audit of the
 authority;
 (4)  [the duties of the port commission as the board of
 pilot commissioners for Harris County ports under Chapter 66,
 Transportation Code;
 [(5)]  the requirements of laws relating to open
 meetings, public information, administrative procedure, financial
 disclosure, and conflicts of interest; and
 (5) [(6)]  any applicable ethics policies adopted by
 the port commission or the Texas Ethics Commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 66.016, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The board may adopt a rule under this chapter involving
 ship movement strategies, including navigation safety guidelines,
 for use by pilots in the navigable water in this state only on a
 recommendation from not less than 80 percent of the pilots
 authorized to operate under the board's jurisdiction.
 SECTION 3.  Section 66.017, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 66.017.  DUTIES. The board shall:
 (1)  establish the number of pilots necessary to
 provide adequate pilot services for each Harris County port;
 (2)  accept applications for pilot licenses and
 certificates and determine whether each applicant meets the
 qualifications for a pilot;
 (3)  submit to the governor lists of applicants the
 board finds to be qualified for appointment as pilots;
 (4)  establish pilotage rates;
 (5)  approve the locations for pilot stations;
 (6)  establish times during which pilot services will
 be available;
 (7)  hear and determine complaints relating to the
 conduct of pilots;
 (8)  recommend to the governor each pilot whose license
 or certificate should not be renewed or should be revoked;
 (9)  adopt rules and issue orders to pilots or vessels
 when necessary to secure efficient pilot services, including
 minimizing the interference of two-way routes;
 (10)  institute investigations or hearings or both to
 consider casualties, accidents, or other actions that violate this
 chapter; and
 (11)  provide penalties to be imposed on a person who is
 not a pilot for a Harris County port who pilots a vessel into or out
 of the port if a pilot offered those services to the vessel.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter B, Chapter 66, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 66.0172 to read as follows:
 Sec. 66.0172.  EFFICIENT PILOT SERVICE; MAXIMUM VESSEL
 LENGTH.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Two-way route" means a directional route within
 defined limits inside which two-way traffic is established, and
 which is intended to improve safety in waters where navigation is
 difficult.
 (2)  "Two-way traffic" means that traffic flow by all
 vessels is permitted in opposing directions.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), in order to ensure
 safe and efficient pilot services, the maximum overall length of a
 vessel, including the bulbous bow, that may be piloted within the
 board's jurisdiction is 1,100 feet.
 (c)  Subject to Section 66.016(c), the board by rule may
 authorize piloting a vessel with an overall length that exceeds the
 maximum overall length provided by Subsection (b) if the board
 determines that the proposed rules would allow two-way routes to be
 maintained efficiently and two-way traffic to be conducted
 efficiently. Before adopting a rule under this subsection, the
 board must hold at least two public hearings.  This subsection does
 not apply to the adoption of rules governing vessel traffic between
 Morgan's Point and the Houston Turning Basin.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2223 passed the Senate on
 April 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2223 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 0, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor