Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2232 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2019

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 2232
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 9, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2232 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the elimination of the effects of federal
 renewable energy subsidies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.159.  ELIMINATING EFFECTS OF RENEWABLE ENERGY
 SUBSIDIES. (a)  The commission shall require the ERCOT independent
 system operator to identify and study the ongoing effects that
 federal renewable energy subsidies have on the pricing,
 reliability, and efficiency of the electric power market in the
 ERCOT power region. The commission shall request comments on the
 study from interested parties.
 (b)  The scope of the study under this section must include
 peak price formation, negative pricing, ancillary services,
 congestion, reserve margins, and transmission costs.
 (c)  The commission shall include in a report required by
 Section 31.003 the results of the study and a description of any
 proposed rules to address the findings of the study.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *