Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2236 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 2236
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2236 By:  Buckingham


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review of the Texas Health Services
 Authority and the repeal of certain provisions affecting the
 electronic exchange of health information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 182, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 182.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 182.004.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas Health
 Services Authority is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code
 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by
 that chapter, the corporation is abolished and this section,
 Section 182.001, and Subchapters B and C expire September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions of the Health and
 Safety Code are repealed:
 (1)  Section 182.003;
 (2)  Section 182.052;
 (3)  Section 182.101(b);
 (4)  Section 182.102(c);
 (5)  Section 182.103(d);
 (6)  Section 182.104(b);
 (7)  Section 182.105(b);
 (8)  Section 182.106(b);
 (9)  Section 182.107(d); and
 (10)  Section 182.108(f).
 SECTION 3.  Section 15(b), Chapter 12 (S.B. 203), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Sections
 182.108(g), (h), (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), and (n), Health and Safety
 Code, effective September 1, 2021, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *