Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2270 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2019

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 2270
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2270 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employment policies for certain health care providers
 employed by medical and dental units.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.977, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.977.  EMPLOYMENT POLICIES FOR CERTAIN PERSONS
 EMPLOYED BY [NURSES IN] MEDICAL AND DENTAL UNITS. (a)  The
 president of a medical and dental unit, as defined by Section
 61.003, shall determine whether a person [nurse] employed by the
 unit for patient care or clinical activities is a full-time
 employee for purposes of:
 (1)  employees group benefits under Chapter 1551 or
 1601, Insurance Code;
 (2)  leave under Chapter 661 or 662, Government Code;
 and
 (3)  longevity pay under Section 659.043, Government
 Code.
 (b)  A determination under Subsection (a) does not entitle a
 person [nurse] who works less than 40 hours a week to the full state
 contribution to the cost of any coverage or benefits.  However, from
 money other than money appropriated from the general revenue fund,
 the employing medical and dental unit may contribute to that cost
 amounts in excess of the state contribution.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *