Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2285 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Fallon S.B. No. 2285
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 1, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2285 By:  Fallon


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to challenges by school districts and open-enrollment
 charter schools to accountability determinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.151, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The rules under Subsection (a) must provide for the
 commissioner to appoint a committee to make recommendations to the
 commissioner on a challenge made to an agency decision relating to
 an academic performance rating or determination or financial
 accountability rating. The committee shall review the challenge
 regardless of the issue identified in the challenge by the school
 district or open-enrollment charter school. The commissioner may
 not appoint an agency employee as a member of the committee.
 (c-1)  The commissioner may not limit a challenge relating to
 a data or calculation error attributable to the school district or
 open-enrollment charter school, even if the challenge demonstrates
 the data or calculation error caused the district or school to have
 a lower academic or financial accountability rating. If a
 challenge demonstrates that the data or calculation error caused
 the district or school to have a lower academic or financial
 accountability rating, the commissioner shall assign the district
 or school the corrected rating or shall indicate that the district
 or school will not be rated for that school year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *