Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2316 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2316
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 23, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2316 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas
 Controlled Substances Act; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 481.003(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The director may adopt rules to administer and enforce
 this chapter, other than Sections 481.073, 481.074, 481.075,
 481.076, 481.0761, 481.0762, 481.0763, 481.0764, 481.0765,
 481.07655, [and] 481.0766, 481.0767, 481.0768, and 481.0769.  The
 board may adopt rules to administer Sections 481.073, 481.074,
 481.075, 481.076, 481.0761, 481.0762, 481.0763, 481.0764,
 481.0765, 481.07655, [and] 481.0766, 481.0767, 481.0768, and
 481.0769.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 481, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 481.07655, 481.0767, 481.0768,
 and 481.0769 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.07655.  LIMITATION OF LIABILITY.  (a)  A prescriber
 or dispenser is not liable in a civil action for damages arising
 from the failure to access prescription drug information as
 required or authorized by Section 481.0764 or failure to submit the
 information to the board as required under Section 481.074(q) or
 481.075, unless the failure constitutes gross negligence or wilful
 misconduct and the prescriber or dispenser would be liable to the
 claimant under other law.
 (b)  This section does not establish a standard of care.
 Sec. 481.0767.  ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a)  The board shall
 establish an advisory committee to make recommendations regarding
 information submitted to the board and access to that information
 under Sections 481.074, 481.075, 481.076, and 481.0761.
 (b)  The board shall appoint the following members to the
 advisory committee:
 (1)  a physician licensed in this state who practices
 in pain management;
 (2)  a physician licensed in this state who practices
 in family medicine;
 (3)  a physician licensed in this state who performs
 surgery;
 (4)  a physician licensed in this state who practices
 in emergency medicine;
 (5)  a dentist licensed in this state who performs oral
 surgery;
 (6)  a podiatrist licensed in this state;
 (7)  a physician assistant to whom a physician has
 delegated the authority to prescribe or order a drug;
 (8)  an advanced practice registered nurse to whom a
 physician has delegated the authority to prescribe or order a drug;
 (9)  a pharmacist working at a chain pharmacy;
 (10)  a pharmacist working at an independent pharmacy;
 (11)  a veterinarian; and
 (12)  an electronic records consultant.
 (c)  Members of the advisory committee serve three-year
 terms. Each member shall serve until the member's replacement has
 been appointed.
 (d)  The advisory committee shall annually elect a presiding
 officer from its members.
 (e)  The advisory committee shall meet at least two times a
 year and at the call of the presiding officer or the board.
 (f)  A member of the advisory committee serves without
 compensation but may be reimbursed by the board for actual expenses
 incurred in performing the duties of the advisory committee.
 (g)  The advisory committee is abolished and this section
 expires on September 1, 2023.
 Sec. 481.0768.  CRIMINAL OFFENSE: DISCLOSURE OR USE OF
 INFORMATION. (a)  A person authorized to receive information under
 Section 481.076(a) commits an offense if the person discloses or
 uses the information in a manner not authorized by this subchapter
 or other law.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 Sec. 481.0769.  ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY:  DISCLOSURE OR USE
 OF INFORMATION.  (a)  A regulatory agency that issues a license,
 certification, or registration to a prescriber or dispenser shall
 periodically update the administrative penalties, or any
 applicable disciplinary guidelines concerning the penalties,
 assessed by that agency for conduct constituting an offense under
 Section 481.0768(a).
 (b)  The agency shall set the penalties in an amount
 sufficient to deter the conduct.
 SECTION 3.  Section 554.051, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (a-2) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  The board may adopt rules to administer Sections
 481.073, 481.074, 481.075, 481.076, 481.0761, 481.0762, 481.0763,
 481.0764, 481.0765, 481.07655, [and] 481.0766, 481.0768, and
 481.0769, Health and Safety Code.
 (a-2)  The board may adopt rules to administer Section
 481.0767, Health and Safety Code.  This subsection expires
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  Section 565.003, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 565.003.  ADDITIONAL GROUNDS FOR DISCIPLINE REGARDING
 APPLICANT FOR OR HOLDER OF NONRESIDENT PHARMACY LICENSE. Unless
 compliance would violate the pharmacy or drug statutes or rules in
 the state in which the pharmacy is located, the board may discipline
 an applicant for or the holder of a nonresident pharmacy license if
 the board finds that the applicant or license holder has failed to
 comply with:
 (1)  Section 481.073, 481.074, [or] 481.075, 481.076,
 481.0761, 481.0762, 481.0763, 481.0764, 481.0765, 481.07655,
 481.0766, 481.0768, or 481.0769, Health and Safety Code;
 (2)  Texas substitution requirements regarding:
 (A)  the practitioner's directions concerning
 generic substitution;
 (B)  the patient's right to refuse generic
 substitution; or
 (C)  notification to the patient of the patient's
 right to refuse substitution;
 (3)  any board rule relating to providing drug
 information to the patient or the patient's agent in written form or
 by telephone; or
 (4)  any board rule adopted under Section 554.051(a)
 and determined by the board to be applicable under Section
 554.051(b).
 SECTION 5.  Not later than September 1, 2020, each
 regulatory agency that issues a license, certification, or
 registration to a prescriber or dispenser shall evaluate and update
 any administrative penalties and guidelines as provided by Section
 481.0769, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  Notwithstanding Section 24, Chapter 485 (H.B.
 2561), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, Section
 481.0764(a), Health and Safety Code, as added by that Act, applies
 only to:
 (1)  a prescriber, other than a veterinarian, who
 issues a prescription for a controlled substance on or after March
 1, 2020; or
 (2)  a person authorized by law to dispense a
 controlled substance, other than a veterinarian, who dispenses a
 controlled substance on or after March 1, 2020.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *