Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2322 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2019

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2322
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 April 11, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 3; April 11, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rates established by municipalities for water and sewer
 services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.0835 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.0835.  PROHIBITION ON RATE DISCRIMINATION. A
 municipality or a municipally owned utility may not establish a
 rate applicable only to entities that qualify for a sales tax or ad
 valorem tax exemption that is higher than a rate established for
 entities that receive comparable utility services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *