Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2343 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2343
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to courses offered jointly by certain public junior
 colleges and independent school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.008, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (g-1) and adding Subsection (g-2) to read as
 follows:
 (g-1)  A public junior college to which this subsection
 applies [with a service area located wholly or partly in a county
 with a population of more than three million] shall enter into an
 agreement with each school district located wholly or partly in a
 county in which the junior college district's service area is
 wholly or partly located [with a population of more than three
 million] to offer one or more courses as provided by this section.
 A student enrolled in a school district to which this subsection
 applies may enroll in a course at any junior college that has
 entered into an agreement with the district to offer the course
 under this subsection.
 (g-2)  Subsection (g-1) applies only to a public junior
 college in:
 (1)  the Blinn College District;
 (2)  the Houston Community College System District;
 (3)  the Lee College District;
 (4)  the Lone Star College System District; or
 (5)  the San Jacinto College District.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *