Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2353 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 2353
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2353 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a fund to assist local governments with
 the acquisition of voting system equipment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 123, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. VOTING SYSTEM FUND
 Sec. 123.091.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Eligible equipment" means voting system
 equipment that complies with applicable state and federal law on
 the date it is acquired.
 (2)  "Fund" means the voting system fund.
 Sec. 123.092.  VOTING SYSTEM FUND. (a)  The voting system
 fund is an account in the general revenue fund.
 (b)  The fund consists of money transferred to the fund at
 the discretion of the legislature.
 (c)  Money in the fund may be appropriated only for a grant
 under Section 123.093.
 (d)  The fund is exempt from the application of Section
 403.095, Government Code.
 Sec. 123.093.  GRANTS FROM FUND. (a)  A county or city may
 apply to the secretary of state for a grant under this subchapter to
 replace voting system equipment.  A county or city is eligible to
 receive a grant equal to not more than 50 percent of the total cost
 of the eligible equipment.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall develop criteria for the
 fair and proportional distribution of grants that consider:
 (1)  the number of voters likely to be served by the
 eligible equipment;
 (2)  the age and condition of any equipment proposed
 for replacement;
 (3)  the need for equitable distribution of grant funds
 to both rural and urban counties and cities;
 (4)  whether the county or city governing body has
 adopted a reasonable long-term plan to address the maintenance,
 repair, and eventual replacement needs for the eligible equipment;
 and
 (5)  any other factor considered relevant by the
 secretary of state.
 (c)  If the total amount requested under qualifying grant
 applications exceeds the total amount available for the purpose of
 awarding grants, amounts shall be allocated using the criteria
 developed by the secretary of state under Subsection (b).
 Sec. 123.094.  APPLICATION FOR GRANT; CERTIFICATION OF
 COSTS.  (a)  To receive a grant under Section 123.093, a county or
 city must submit an application to the secretary of state. The
 secretary of state shall prescribe a form for the application.
 (b)  The application must describe:
 (1)  the type or types of eligible equipment proposed
 for purchase or lease;
 (2)  the expected total cost of the eligible equipment
 and any sources of funding that will be used for its purchase or
 lease in addition to the grant funding provided by this subchapter;
 (3)  the county's or city's plan to address the
 long-term maintenance, repair, and eventual replacement costs for
 the eligible equipment; and
 (4)  any other information required by the secretary of
 state.
 (c)  The secretary of state shall establish:
 (1)  a deadline for receipt of grant applications;
 (2)  a procedure for awarding and distributing grants;
 and
 (3)  a process for verifying the proper use of the
 grants after distribution.
 SECTION 2.  The secretary of state is required to implement a
 provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the secretary of
 state may, but is not required to, implement a provision of this Act
 using other appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *