Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB24 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2019

                    By: Lucio, Bettencourt S.B. No. 24
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 11, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 March 13, 2019, rereferred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 27, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 27, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 24 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of informational materials and certain
 other information to a pregnant woman before an abortion.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 171.012, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The information required to be provided under
 Subsections (a)(1) and (2) may not be provided by audio or video
 recording and must be provided at least 24 hours before the abortion
 is to be performed:
 (1)  orally and in person in a private and confidential
 setting if the pregnant woman currently lives less than 100 miles
 from the nearest abortion provider that is a facility licensed
 under Chapter 245 or a facility that performs more than 50 abortions
 in any 12-month period; or
 (2)  orally by telephone on a private call or in person
 in a private and confidential setting if the pregnant woman
 certifies that the woman currently lives 100 miles or more from the
 nearest abortion provider that is a facility licensed under Chapter
 245 or a facility that performs more than 50 abortions in any
 12-month period.
 (f)  The physician who is to perform the abortion, or the
 physician's designee, shall in person hand to the pregnant woman a
 copy of the informational materials described by Section 171.014:
 (1)  on the day of the consultation required under
 Subsection (a)(4) for a pregnant woman who lives less than 100 miles
 from the nearest abortion provider that is a facility licensed
 under Chapter 245 or a facility in which more than 50 abortions are
 performed in any 12-month period; or
 (2)  before any sedative or anesthesia is administered
 to the pregnant woman on the day of the abortion and at least two
 hours before the abortion if the woman lives 100 miles or more from
 the nearest abortion provider that is a facility licensed under
 Chapter 245 or a facility in which more than 50 abortions are
 performed in any 12-month period.
 SECTION 2.  Section 171.012, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an abortion performed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *